Financial history 700 CLUB

Charity number: 1056192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.21m £1.86m £1.43m £2.25m £2.87m
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.38m £1.59m £2.06m £2.54m
Income from government contracts £408.61k £426.82k £1.04m £1.44m £389.60k
Income from government grants £1.47m £977.92k £37.33k £420.00k £646.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.76k £29.18k £25.56k £17.84k £19.57k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.18m £1.83m £1.40m £2.23m £2.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.27k £90 £87 £110 £6.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.42k £303 £49
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.38m £1.59m £2.06m £2.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £917 £816 £1.32k
Expenditure - Governance £44.93k £38.22k £12.74k £26.80k £25.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £68.57k £66.77k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0