THE ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RTWRT undertake Charitable events and our main event is an Annual Fireworks Display in Dunorlan Park, Tunbridge Wells attended by an estimated 10,000 people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 17 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Richard Addis | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Vincent Timoney | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Patrick Brian Mockford | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.10k | £62.70k | £2.39k | £0 | £52.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.07k | £50.03k | £2.00k | £0 | £25.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HEREBY DECLARE THAT THEY SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME OR ANY PART OF PARTS THEROF AND THE INCOME ARISING THEREFROM OR ANY PARTS THEROF FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Impala Gardens
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Kent
TN4 9PZ
- Phone:
- 07795964130
- Email:
- rtwrta@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window