TENTERDEN LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To undertake projects locally in Kent for children sunior citizens and individuals needing support. to support local hospitals, hospice and senior citizens day centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 18 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Alistair Caridia | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Hugh Davies | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Darnell | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Groves | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Groves | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARRY EDWARD CHEESMUR | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.70k | £5.86k | £12.45k | £10.22k | £15.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.48k | £4.36k | £14.70k | £8.12k | £15.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oaks
Swain Road
TENTERDEN
Kent
TN30 6PJ
- Phone:
- 07835604729
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window