Governing document EMI ARCHIVE TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 MAY 1996. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 AUG 2018 as amended on 01 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH AND IN PARTICULAR TO FOSTER THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF (I) THE ART TECHNIQUE AND DEVELOPMENT OF SOUND RECORDING AND THE HISTORY OF THE SOUND RECORDING INDUSTRY. (II) THE TECHNIQUES DEVELOPMENT AND HISTORY OF ELECTRONIC ELECTRICAL LIGHTING AND ASSOCIATED PRODUCTS (III) THE ARCHIVE MATERIAL OF THORN EMI PLC AND OR ITS ASSOCIATED COMPANIES ("THE ARCHIVE")
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.