CYLCH MEITHRIN BRYNGWRAN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bryngwran Cylch Meithrin provides part time pre-school care. Children will receive appropriate attention & support in order to meet their unique needs. They will benefit from every opportunity to play, benefit fom early years experiences through the medium of Welsh. They will be stimulated to enable them to develop to their full potential & guidance which will enable them to become a full memeber
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 20 June 1996: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 August 2010: Standard registration
- 12 May 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- Brain Bach Bryngwran (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.25k | £29.76k | £25.74k | £56.94k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.99k | £32.48k | £32.77k | £45.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.82k | £25.56k | £9.63k | £32.69k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CYFANSODDIAD Y CYLCH YN AMGAEEDIG.DERBYNIWYD GAN Y PWYLLGOR AR 22 EBRILL 1996. CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APRIL 1996.
Charitable objects
AMCANION Y GYMDEITHAS YW HYRWYDDO ADDYSG PLANT DAN OED YSGOL YN MRYNGWRAN TRWY GYFRWNG YR IAITH GYMRAEG.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN BRYNGWRAN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE.
Area of benefit
BRYNGWRAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window