Hope Community Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the church range from regular meetings on Sundays for praise & worship of God, provision of children's and youth classes to help understand the Christian gospel, advice & support for struggling parents in the community, debt counselling and emergency food aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 June 1996: Standard registration
- MEADOWS COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- THE MEADOWS COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Pearce | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Amy Cassandra Longmore | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Joy Allen | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John MacDiarmid | Trustee | 26 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP JOHN BEYNON | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MIKE PEARCE | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.44k | £154.87k | £169.80k | £190.34k | £226.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.64k | £156.78k | £180.66k | £199.85k | £242.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 1995 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1996, 8 DECEMBER 1996, 1 FEBRUARY 2000, 12 DECEMBER 2000 AND 30 OCTOBER 2001. AS AMENDED ON 03/03/2015 as amended on 29 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHURCH IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE RELIGION (EVANGELICAL CHRISTIANITY) AND TO FURTHER OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE ELDERS IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING WHERE IT IS FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, RESTORATION OR IMPROVEMENT OF A BUILDING OR OTHER STRUCTURE WHICH IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AND WIDER GLOBAL COMMUNITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHURCH?S STATEMENT OF FAITH. THE BUILDING THE CHURCH MEETS IN: 1. IS A PLACE OF WORSHIP 2. IS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC 3. IS SITUATED IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 BULL HEAD STREET
WIGSTON
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE18 1PA
- Phone:
- 01162884321
- Website:
-
Www.hopechurchwigston.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window