AHAVAS SHALOM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity collects funds to assist in the furtherance of Jewish education and religion, to relieve poverty and to alleviate hardship generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 June 1996: Standard registration
- AHAVAS CHESSED (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Grunsfeld | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
SHULOM FELDMAN | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
JACOB GERTNER | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.69k | £230.98k | £760.99k | £685.04k | £201.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.87k | £258.22k | £702.93k | £602.96k | £196.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £748.43k | £665.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £7.70k | £12.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £2 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £4.87k | £7.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £696.36k | £600.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £6.57k | £2.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | £1.56k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £281.02k | £128.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/04/2011
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHERE THE TRUSTEES HAVE DISCRETION AS TO THE CHARITIES SELECTED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BRANTWOOD ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4EN
- Phone:
- 01617928764
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window