CENTREPOINT OUTREACH

Charity number: 1056296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charitable provision of relief for homeless and vulnerable persons in and around Boston, together with the provision of clothing, food and household goods.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £226,001
Total expenditure: £212,602

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD OLIVER LOCKE-WHEATON Chair
None on record
Rev David Stephenson Trustee 18 September 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BOSTON
Received: On time
THE BOSTON STUMP RESTORATION TRUST
Received: On time
SIR THOMAS MEDDLECOTT'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
BOSTON MUNICIPAL NON-EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Nicola Jane Richardson Trustee 21 February 2024
None on record
Rev Sally Ann Clifton Trustee 02 December 2021
THE BOSTON STUMP RESTORATION TRUST
Received: On time
Michael John Sharp Trustee 17 February 2021
THE REVEREND ANTHONY BARNES CHARITY
Received: On time
WYBERTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
YARBOROUGH COTTAGES
Received: On time
Joanna Criddle Trustee 05 February 2020
None on record
Paul Andrew Clark Trustee 25 October 2016
None on record
Rev ALAN LEONARD TAYLOR Trustee 09 April 2014
None on record
Peter Frederick Lawson Trustee 31 July 2013
THOMAS SANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BOSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALISON MARY AUSTIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £134.68k £210.11k £329.77k £184.03k £226.00k
Total expenditure £150.10k £168.50k £177.79k £163.09k £212.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.43k £100.20k £89.82k £18.94k £37.10k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BELMONT HOUSE
15 RED LION STREET
BOSTON
PE21 6PZ
Phone:
01205360900