Accounts and annual returns TORBAY ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity Number: 1056312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 06 February 2023 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 06 February 2023 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 10 March 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 10 March 2021 100 days late Download Open in new window