NORTHERN YOUTH SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 1056331
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 June 1996: Standard registration
- 09 December 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- NJPO (Working name)
- NYSO (Working name)
- NORTHERN JUNIOR PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2004 | 13 October 2005 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 1996, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 APRIL 1997. NAME CHANGED 16 OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE ARTS IN SOCIETY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH REGION IN ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window