NATIONAL URBAN FORESTRY UNIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 1996: Standard registration
- 11 September 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NUFU (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 JULY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 7 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
TO (1) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF URBAN AND URBAN FRINGE FORESTRY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION OF WIDER PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ROLE AND IMPORTANCE OF URBAN AND URBAN FRINGE FORESTRY (2) ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE PHYSICAL NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENT (3) ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC URBAN AND URBAN FRINGE FORESTS AND TO (4) PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING PEOPLE'S CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
UK AND WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window