Accounts and annual returns THE PET SHOP GIRLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1056359
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 January 2015 23 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2015 Not Required
Annual return 18 January 2014 17 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2014 Not Required
Annual return 18 January 2013 05 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2013 Not Required
Annual return 18 January 2012 25 March 2013 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2012 Not Required