THE PET SHOP GIRLS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of special needs equipment for special needs persons, funding treatment for disabled persons and assistance to children in full time education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 January 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 June 1996: Standard registration
- 18 August 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PET SHOP GIRLS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/01/2011 | 18/01/2012 | 18/01/2013 | 18/01/2014 | 18/01/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.67k | £13.63k | £14.60k | £11.83k | £16.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.93k | £17.30k | £11.50k | £12.91k | £22.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 January 2015 | 23 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 January 2014 | 17 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 January 2013 | 05 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 January 2012 | 25 March 2013 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVLEY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window