BRENTWOOD DIOCESEAN CATHEDRAL AND CHORAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1056374
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees have expended funds on maintaining the cathedral and funding Ley Clerks to the choir.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £53,371
Total expenditure: £90,987

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Martin Boland Trustee 05 March 2017
THE J A R CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Alan Stephen Williams sm Trustee 01 July 2014
THE REVEREND CANON FRANCIS WALTER GILBERT FOR THE CHURCH OF OUR LADY OF LOURDES AND ST JOSEPH, LEIGH-ON-SEA
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
NOTRE DAME REFUGEE CENTRE
Received: On time
NOTRE DAME DE FRANCE – SOCIETY OF MARY
Received: On time
FORMATIO
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF MARY (MARIST FATHERS) CIO
Received: On time
MR CHRISTOPHER NEIL HUNTER-GORDON Trustee 23 November 2011
None on record
PHILIP TOLHURST Trustee 31 May 1996
None on record
GERALD VINCENT BODENHAM THOMPSON Trustee
None on record
RT REV DAVID MICHAEL MANSON Trustee
None on record
PHILIP JOHN TOLHURST Trustee
ESSEX SHIRE HALL TRUST
Received: 10 days late
NORMAN GARON TRUST
Received: On time
FOWLER SMITH AND JONES TRUST
Received: On time
SIMON ANDREW DALTON HALL MBE DL Trustee
COLCHESTER AND NORTH EAST ESSEX BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
MARIANNE O'SULLIVAN Trustee
THE GILLOW OF LILYSTONE HALL TRUST STOCK ACCOUNT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £67.55k £53.47k £61.58k £53.33k £53.37k
Total expenditure £69.35k £52.77k £63.45k £76.76k £90.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 October 2024 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 28 October 2024 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 11 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 26 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 05 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 05 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THIRD FLOOR
MARLBOROUGH HOUSE
VICTORIA ROAD SOUTH
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM1 1LN
Phone:
02038138595
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available