Financial history WILD THINGS RES-Q (WILTSHIRE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL)

Charity number: 1056375
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £66.95k £62.45k £230.48k £57.37k £110.59k
Total expenditure £50.94k £47.28k £52.73k £46.32k £83.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £150 N/A N/A N/A N/A