Financial history PARENT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF THE AMERICAN SCHOOL IN LONDON

Charity number: 1056386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £188.62k £20.60k £37.47k £220.39k £86.64k
Total expenditure £75.61k £43.31k £88.57k £120.92k £149.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A