HILLSIDE COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
organising fundraising events to provide entertainment and eduacational materials to the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 26 June 1996: Standard registration
- HILLSIDE SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Pearson | Chair | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carley Puxon | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca James | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Frances Richards | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.35k | £15.09k | £10.40k | £5.96k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.49k | £11.24k | £12.53k | £12.77k | £10.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 February 2023 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHEMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hillside Community First School
Hillside Road
VERWOOD
Dorset
BH31 7HE
- Phone:
- 01202 822737
- Email:
- Hillsidefirstpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
hillsidefirst.dorset.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window