ACKWORTH SCHOOL 1950 TRUST

Charity number: 1056414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To hold funds of gifts, legacies, donations, etc. for the benefit of Ackworth School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £14,143
Total expenditure: £20,050

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • City Of Wakefield
  • Kirklees
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID BUNNEY Chair 14 March 2013
WENNINGTON SCHOOL BURSARY FUND
Received: On time
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
Received: On time
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
Received: 105 days late
Stephen Bunney Trustee 01 September 2023
MARKET RASEN ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITIES
Received: On time
HOSPITAL OF SIR GEORGE ST PAUL
Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days
Guy Townsend Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rachel Belk Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Digby Geoffrey Swift Trustee 01 September 2015
BRECKENBROUGH SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
QUAKERS IN YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
WENNINGTON SCHOOL BURSARY FUND
Received: On time
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
Received: On time
ANDREW WHITELEY Trustee 01 September 2015
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
Received: 105 days late
WENNINGTON SCHOOL BURSARY FUND
Received: On time
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
Received: On time
CAROL RAYNER Trustee 23 January 2012
WENNINGTON SCHOOL BURSARY FUND
Received: On time
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
Received: On time
ACKWORTH AND FRESHFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
Received: 105 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £18.82k £15.79k £17.25k £14.32k £14.14k
Total expenditure £2.00k £0 £1.07k £0 £20.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 November 2024 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 September 2022 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ACKWORTH SCHOOL
PONTEFRACT ROAD
ACKWORTH
PONTEFRACT
WF7 7LT
Phone:
01977233600
Website:

No information available