Trustees PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (PTFA) OF THE MALCOLM SARGENT GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOL

Charity number: 1056448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Suzanne Williamson Chair 24 September 2024
None on record
Louise Ann Clark Trustee 15 November 2024
None on record
Kirsty Kent Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Magdalen MacCormack Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Abigail Amores Sampedro Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Peasgood Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Samantha Hammond Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Karen Reid Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record