THE OLIVE BRANCH CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons resident in Winchester and the surrounding area who are suffering from emotional or mental stress by the provision of counselling services in a Christian context.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 June 1996: Standard registration
- 11 March 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 March 2011: Funds transferred to 1140475 The Olive Branch Counselling Service Limited
- OLIVE BRANCH CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE (Working name)
- THE OLIVE BRANCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2006 | 31/05/2007 | 31/05/2008 | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.11k | £34.43k | £45.57k | £48.69k | £49.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.55k | £36.11k | £40.63k | £43.72k | £44.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | 23 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | 19 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | 10 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | 10 February 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 23 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 23 February 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | 03 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | 03 March 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 30 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEE THINK FIT 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN WINCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT AND SUPERVISION INCLUDING TRAINING AND STUDY FACILITIES FOR COUNSELLORS: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
WINCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window