HOOE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1056472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Spent on theatre company visit to school, Outdoor classroom bought - this money had been raised over several years. Money raised by disco, sponsored event, movie night, Xmas craft fair plus some smaller events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £3,290
Total expenditure: £2,059

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Plymouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosie Mortimer Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Karlie Owen Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Becky Saxton Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.34k £7.32k £6.84k £26.81k £3.29k
Total expenditure £8.85k £6.45k £2.10k £33.15k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £6.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £6.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 March 2021 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Pollard Close
Hooe
PLYMOUTH
PL9 9RR
Phone:
01752 402042
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available