THE AFRICA PEACE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 1996: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AFRICA BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION WHICH HELPS PEOPLE TO UNDERSTAND THE CAUSES OF DISEASE AND ITS MOST EFFECTIVE TREATMENT. 2. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED THROUGHOUT AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD CLOTHES AND OTHER NECESSITIES OF LIFE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3. TO PROMOTE PEACE THROUGHOUT AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF A MEDIATION SERVICE WHICH WILL ENDEAVOUR TO SETTLE LOCAL CONFLICTS PEACEFULLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window