Hillingdon Hospitals Charity

Charity Number: 1056493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PRINCIPALLY, THE CHARITY RECEIVES DONATIONS FROM PATIENTS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND AIMS TO UTILISE THEM PRIMARILY TO ENHANCE THE WELFARE AND AMENITIES OF PATIENTS AND STAFF ABOVE AND BEYOND THE LEVELS FUNDED BY THE NHS. DURING THE YEAR, THE CHARITY CONTINUED TO RECEIVE THE VALUED SUPPORT OF FUNDRAISER AND THE TRUSTEES THANK ALL OF THEM FOR THEIR TIME AND HARD WORK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £489,000
Total expenditure: £604,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Hillingdon Hospitals Charity (Working name)
  • THE HILLINGDON HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL AMENITIES FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
  • THE HILLINGDON HOSPITAL NHS TRUST GENERAL AMENITIES FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE HILLINGDON HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST Trustee 09 January 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £927.00k £686.00k £227.00k £291.00k £489.00k
Total expenditure £395.00k £547.00k £235.00k £262.00k £604.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £917.00k £676.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £383.00k £533.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.00k £14.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £24.00k £27.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £6.00k £7.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26/03/1997
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE CLINICS, HEALTH CENTRES, AND DAY CENTRES MANAGED BY THE HARROW AND HILLINGDON HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 05 July 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
HILLINGDON HOSPITAL
PIELD HEATH ROAD
UXBRIDGE
UB8 3NN
Phone:
01895279954