PostScript 360 Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support people to withdraw safely from prescription drug dependence of benzodiazepines (tranquillisers), Z drugs, pain killers and other similar drugs, prescribed or bought illicitly, through a wrap-around service of one to one therapy, group therapy, advocacy, a telephone support service, knowledge sharing with health professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 July 1996: Standard registration
- BATTLE AGAINST TRANQUILLISERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Deamer | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dionne Smart | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Knight | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE WYNNE | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.13k | £92.00k | £23.70k | £33.00k | £34.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.48k | £108.00k | £106.05k | £129.00k | £102.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8 MARCH 1996 as amended on 24 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS IN THE BRISTOL AND AVON AREA SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF MISUSE OR ADDICTION TO TRANQUILLISING DRUGS IN THE BENZODIAZEPINE GROUP AND TO PREVENT SUCH MISUSE OR ADDICTIONS.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND AVON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
PostScript360 Limited
First floor
East Wing
Britannia Road
Kingswood
BS15 8DB
- Phone:
- 01179663629
- Email:
- info@postscript360.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window