ALAN GEORGE GREEN DECEASED WILL TRUST CHURCH MUSIC FUND
Charity number: 1056513
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PAY/HELP TO PAY FOR ORGANISTS OR RECORDED MUSIC IN CHURCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Total income: £626
Total expenditure: £500
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Derbyshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 03 July 1996: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- ALAN GEORGE GREEN DECEASED WILL TRUST ORGANISTS SALARY FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £857 | £615 | £577 | £605 | £626 | |
|
Total expenditure | £900 | £1.00k | £750 | £500 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 03 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 03 March 2013 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10 MAY 1998 AND 6 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF THE CHURCH MUSIC OF THE CHURCH OF THE PARISH OF ST MARTINS, ALFRETON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ALFRETON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window