CYLCH YSGOL FEITHRIN WAUNFAWR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide 20 hours a week of childcare through the medium of Welsh to children from 2 yrs old to 4 yrs of age. We also offer a weekly mother & baby group for local mothers to meet up and introduce their babies/toddlers to Welsh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £8,877 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 03 July 1996: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 April 2014: Re-registered
- 16 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.10k | £24.44k | £10.61k | £15.72k | £15.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.75k | £33.18k | £9.13k | £15.31k | £14.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £8.08k | £6.37k | £8.13k | £8.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 12 July 2020 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 12 July 2020 | 528 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CYFANSODDIAD Y CYLCH YN AMGAEEDIG DERBYNWYD GAN Y PWYLLGOR AR 16 APRIL 1996.CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
AMCANION Y GYMDEITHAS YW HYRWYDDO ADDYSG PLANT DAN OED YSGOL YN WAUNFAWR TRWY GYFRWNG YR IAITH GYMREAG.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN WAUNFAWR THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE
Area of benefit
WAUNFAWR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window