Financial history WALES MOBILITY DRIVING ASSESSMENT SERVICE

Charity number: 1056588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £470.98k £463.71k £487.00k £594.57k £665.96k
Total expenditure £442.35k £471.85k £556.00k £593.61k £615.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £265.46k £265.00k £265.00k £360.00k £360.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £6.36k £9.71k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £587.63k £655.21k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £584 £1.04k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £593.61k £615.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £4.13k £5.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0