THE CLD TRUST, COUNSELLING LEARNING AND DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CLD Trust is a Herefordshire based mental health and well-being charity, providing timely and high quality therapeutic interventions. Through projects and programmes, early intervention, participation and prevention work with children young people and families, it enables the achievement of good mental health and well-being. The Trust works in close partnership with local NHS services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 04 July 1996: Standard registration
- 23 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 23 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1187873 THE CLD TRUST
- CLD YOUTH COUNSELLING TRUST (Working name)
- CLD YOUTH COUNSELLING CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £446.63k | £399.26k | £432.40k | £327.29k | £419.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £383.06k | £450.50k | £504.42k | £404.30k | £401.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 12 January 2021 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/04/2005 AS AMENDED ON 13/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE PROVISION OF A THERAPEUTIC COUNSELLING, TRAINING, AND SUPPORT SERVICE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE AGE GROUP COMMENCING IN THE ELEVENTH YEAR UNTIL THE THIRTIETH YEAR OR ADULTS IN SPECIFIC MULTI-AGENCY PARTNERSHIPS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES
Area of benefit
HEREFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window