Accounts and annual returns PORTSMOUTH FOYER LIMITED

Charity number: 1056602
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 10 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 20 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 20 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 04 March 2008 33 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 20 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 February 2007 16 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 04 July 2006 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 04 July 2006 154 days late