Financial history THE GHEEZ RITE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1056622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.44k £3.98k £37.77k £45.65k £38.92k
Total expenditure £19.60k £7.58k £9.78k £23.56k £32.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A £7.83k £7.00k £7.55k