FRIENDS OF HIGHGATE SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal activities are to provide funds to support the continuing education at Highgate School of any student whose parents have died or whose family financial circumstances have deteriorated unexpectedly, to fund the education at Highgate School of students whose parents could not afford the fees without financial support and to provide educational facilities and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 July 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Stanislaus Dodd QC | Chair | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Oyeyi | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sunetra Fernando | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jeremy Epstein | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthieu Alain Benoit Marie Michon | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Wong | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Greg Campbell | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JON MICHAEL POLLEDRI | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Jessica Frances Morelle | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Henry Bovey | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALEXANDER HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADAM SVEN PETTITT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.98k | £173.73k | £173.57k | £146.66k | £209.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.36k | £572.79k | £243.86k | £187.95k | £253.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1945 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 26 JUNE 1954 AND 9 JULY 1958
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highgate School
North Road
Highgate
LONDON
N6 4AY
- Phone:
- 02083401524
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window