Accounts and annual returns HOME-START(BRENT)

Charity number: 1056631
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 04 April 2007 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 04 April 2007 63 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 01 February 2006 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 01 February 2006 1 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 25 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 25 January 2005 On Time