Financial history THE ROY KINNEAR CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1056641
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £1.46m £963.34k £1.07m £959.44k £987.48k
Total expenditure £1.53m £965.32k £945.79k £925.74k £940.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.70k £38.22k £137.79k £28.33k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.42m £925.12k £930.97k £931.11k £987.48k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £404 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £957.35k £925.96k £919.50k £927.24k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.61k £7.97k £5.53k £5.95k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.50k