CONSULTANCY COUNSELLING TRAINING AND LEADERSHIP (C.C.T.L)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Children/young People
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 July 1996: Standard registration
- 03 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- C C T L - SIDE BY SIDE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81 | £125 | £180 | £260 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 03 June 2008 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 16 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 29TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SUFFOLK, TO RELIEVE SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window