New Forest Solent District Scout Council

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Scout District is to provide support and assistance to the Scout Groups within the District, in order to achieve the purpose of Scouting as laid down by the Scout Association in their P.O.R., Chapter 1 - Fundamentals of Scouting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
224 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 July 1996: Standard registration
- NEW FOREST EAST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Stickley | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Liscoe | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Holmes | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hilliam | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Holmes | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Janson | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KERIE WALLACE | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|||||
RHODA IVY LARAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15k | £2.80k | £464 | £407 | £63.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.29k | £2.67k | £795 | £0 | £41.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2023 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NEW FOREST SOUTH EAST AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Kelvin Close
Hythe
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 5LW
- Phone:
- 02380848098
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window