WHAPLODE C.E. PRIMARY SCHOOL SWIMMING POOL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise monies to run, organise and maintain a swimming pool at Whaplode C of E primary school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 July 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Booth | Chair | 18 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Darlow | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Murphy | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Christie | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE ROUS | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.95k | £3.35k | £12.93k | £14.06k | £14.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.97k | £1.86k | £14.60k | £10.43k | £10.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SWIMMING POOL IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SWIMMING CLASSES. C) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WHAPLODE LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whaplode C of E Primary School
Mill Lane
Whaplode
Spalding
PE12 6TS
- Phone:
- 01406370447
- Email:
- mark-rainy@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window