RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of christians and non-christians who are poor by means of relief support and assistance in this country and abroad to alleviate their lack of necessities of life such as food clothing and to promote christian faith in Jesus Christ as Lord by means of education and of preaching the good news of the Lord. By provision of Bibles and other educational materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Throughout London
- Angola
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Zambia
Governance
- 10 July 1996: Standard registration
- JOY COMMUNICATIONS INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Frank Thomas | Chair | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIE MARIE THOMAS | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elijah Marie Thomas | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGE D'OR THOMAS | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.42k | £6.94k | £7.59k | £7.31k | £6.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.34k | £6.13k | £7.91k | £7.48k | £7.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH JUNE 1996, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8TH JULY 1996, 24TH JULY 1997 AND 23RD AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHRISTIANS AND NON-CHRISTIANS WHO ARE POOR PARTICULARLY BY MEANS OF RELIEF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE IN THIS COUNTRY AND ABROAD IN ORDER TO ALLEVIATE THEIR LACK OF NECESSITIES OF LIFE THROUGH PROVISION OF SUCH ITEMS AS CLOTHING FOOD AND OTHER FACILITIES WHICH INCLUDE PROVISION FOR SCHOOLS AND HOSPITALS (2) TO PROMOTE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST AS LORD IN THIS COUNTRY AND ABROAD BY MEANS OF EDUCATION AND OF PREACHING THE GOOD NEWS OF THE LORD (3) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES TO HELP CHRISTIANS AND NON-CHRISTIANS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY PROVISION OF BIBLES BOOKS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
85 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 0300 102 1548
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window