Financial history WELLSPRING COMMUNITY CHURCH CARLISLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1056693
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £23.96k £9.43k £3.86k £2.34k £475
Total expenditure £16.27k £13.15k £8.53k £19.01k £17.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A