IMECE TURKISH SPEAKING WOMEN'S GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Islington
Governance
- 10 July 1996: Standard registration
- 09 February 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 February 2007: Funds transferred to 1101882 IMECE WOMEN'S CENTRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.94k | £249.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.97k | £240.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 23 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 30 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 04 March 2005 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 04 March 2005 | 32 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 20TH NOVEMBER 1994 (AS AMENDED ON 23RD JUNE 1996)
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF WOMEN WHO RESIDE OR WORK IN THE BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR TURKISH CYPRIOT / TURKISH / KURDISH / TURKISH SPEAKING WOMEN FROM TURKEY OR LONDON BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID WOMEN AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID WOMEN, AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES.(B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE OR MEETING SPACE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OS ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window