STROLLERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Strollers provides refreshments for retired and disabled people on The Goldsworth Park in Woking Surrey. We also provide a sigh posting service for our customers and activities and outings tailored to our customers needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 July 1996: Standard registration
- 01 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GOLDSWORTH PARK DROP IN CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.16k | £23.36k | £22.52k | £22.42k | £4.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.87k | £23.18k | £20.58k | £21.34k | £12.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | £15.22k | £15.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 10 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 03 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ,OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window