WOMEN'S IVORY TOWER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General support for the intergration of the African Francophone community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 July 1996: Standard registration
- FEMME TOUR DIVOIRE (Working name)
- FEMME TOUR D'IVOIRE (Working name)
- WITA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOLANDE BIDI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZEFF ZAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIE LAURENCE TAPE PANZO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE JACCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ZUNON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12 | £12 | £12 | £13 | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE IVORIAN PERSONS (PARTICULARLY WOMEN AND CHILDREN) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER. (B) TO EDUCATE, RELIEVE AND REHABILITATE YOUNG IVORIAN PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYEMENT OR ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE IN THEIR FORMAL EDUCATION. (C) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND CULTURE ASSOCIATED WITH THE IVORY COAST. (D) TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS BY ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS (E) TO IDENTIFY AND HIGHLIGHT ISSUES OF COMMON CONCERN TO IVORIAN WOMEN WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING THEIR SELF-CONFIDENCE AND RELIEVING THEIR ISOLATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO ACHEIVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8b Brunswick Park
Camberwell
London
SE5 7RH
- Phone:
- 02077019007
- Email:
- wita_uk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window