Accounts and annual returns CRESWICK PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1056726
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2010 01 April 2011 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 01 April 2011 1 days late
Annual return 31 August 2009 24 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 25 March 2010 On Time