Financial history THE WIGWAM TRUST

Charity number: 1056752
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015
Total gross income £4.65k £3.49k £3.98k £2.96k £2.45k
Total expenditure £62.07k £11.96k £11.24k £29.89k £50.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A