COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Road Safety through education and training by providing mentoring to motorcyclists in preparation for the advanced motorcycle test and other qualifications regulated by the Institute of Advanced Motorcyclists. Provides recreation, social and skills support with the overall aim of improving road safety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 July 1996: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 September 2016: Re-registered
- COVENTRY AND WARWICK ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Antony Lunt | Chair | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beth Cordrey | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Kwok | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Scullion | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Mason | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neville Gordon Pugh | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Chivers | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ford | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Lilley | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Godfrey Langford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter Ian Collard | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.33k | £462 | £3.80k | £3.55k | £3.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £2.12k | £3.23k | £5.67k | £3.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2023 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF RIDING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Whitehead Drive
Wellesbourne
WARWICK
CV35 9PW
- Phone:
- 01789842994
- Email:
- information@cwam.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window