Financial history SOUTH EAST HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1056845
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011
Total gross income £208.34k £31.03k £29.60k £29.50k £559
Total expenditure £204.15k £31.06k £32.36k £31.48k £2.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A