MONKWEARMOUTH CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church activities, serving the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 16 July 1996: Standard registration
- 05 April 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 05 April 2017: Funds transferred to 1068899 NEW SPRINGS UK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.26k | £44.18k | £34.38k | £34.02k | £32.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.39k | £38.01k | £40.87k | £26.59k | £22.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 05 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 05 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 29 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 29 June 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT 2)TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT 3)TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window