Financial history THE GARSTANG AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1056868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £9.52k £130.63k £171.90k £127.18k £175.08k
Total expenditure £24.66k £121.14k £143.25k £162.93k £161.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.04k N/A N/A N/A