REGARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A national group that provides information/support for lesbians, bisexuals, gay men, transgender, queer and intersex people who self-identify as disabled. We try to address our member's social isolation through our website, online discussion groups and other social contact. We campaign to represent LGBTQI issues to the disabled community and disabled people's issues to the LGBTQI community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR JU GOSLING | Chair |
|
||||||
Philip Martyn Reynolds | Trustee | 19 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR PHIL GOSLING | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIA DENISE NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
KAREN CHRISTINE SHOOK | Trustee |
|
||||||
CLIVE WADE STREETER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 9 DECEMBER 2004 AND 13 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR DISABLED PEOPLE WHO ARE LESBIAN, BISEXUAL, GAY OR WHO SELF-IDENTIFY AS TRANSGENDERED, BY THE PROVISION OF AN INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE IN ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THEIR DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SECRETARY, REGARD
BM REGARD
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 07444 419980
- Email:
- secretary@regard.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window