WALLINGTON CHRISTIAN OUTREACH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is to provide opportunities for outreach through the operation of a Christian bookshop known as "The Oasis Christian Centre".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 July 1996: Standard registration
- THE OASIS CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY FRENCH | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|||||
JANIS KAY HAWKINS | Trustee | 10 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
Julian George Hawkins MA | Trustee | 29 August 1996 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.80k | £98.03k | £127.77k | £139.55k | £181.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.82k | £108.79k | £131.79k | £149.78k | £175.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £641 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1994, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21ST JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
WALLINGTON, SURREY, AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oasis Christian Bookshop
39 Woodcote Road
WALLINGTON
Surrey
SM6 0LH
- Phone:
- 02087731428
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window