ASSEMBLY HALL TRUST, JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (BRISTOL DISTRICT)'
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 17 July 1996: Standard registration
- 16 September 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 September 2022: Funds transferred to 216647 INTERNATIONAL BIBLE STUDENTS ASSOCIATION
- BRISTOL ASSEMBLY HALL (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.45k | £243.36k | £207.58k | £133.27k | £564 | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.73k | £306.96k | £267.51k | £170.98k | £79.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 August 2020 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 August 2020 | 42 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/03/1986 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/07/1988
Charitable objects
(A) INVESTMENT PENDING EXPENDITURE ON THE ACQUISITION AND SUBSEQUENT MAINTENANCE OF SUITABLE FREEHOLD OR LEASEHOLD PROPERTY AS REFERRED TO IN CLAUSE 2 OF THE TRUST DEED (B) MEETINGS OR SERVICES FOR THE WORSHIP OF GOD AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE TEACHINGS CONTAINED IN THE BIBLE (C) DISTRIBUTING BIBLES AND BOOKS MAGAZINES TRACTS AND OTHER MEDIA TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF GOD AND THE BIBLE AND THE PRACTICE OF CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BIBLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window